THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARNABAS, SWANMORE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities for general public/mankind through services by provision of buildings/facilities and open space. Grants are made to other organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 31 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF SWANMORE, ST BARNABAS (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Sharpe | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Douglas David Emmett | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew George Davis | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Louise Sandoval | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Dyer | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Christa Stuart SAJO | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Lawrence Bakewell | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derrinda Ann Laing | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jane Vost | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Frampton | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Allison May Gurry | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David MarK Lee | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Jenny Sharpe | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JANET CHANT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.18k | £100.40k | £113.75k | £132.37k | £143.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.84k | £100.85k | £105.44k | £122.47k | £143.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | £8.79k | £5.50k | £3.70k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 December 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 December 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 DONIGERS DELL
SWANMORE
SOUTHAMPTON
SO32 2TL
- Phone:
- 07973404465
- Email:
- office@swanmore.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window