THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, BURNHAM

Charity Number: 1129189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St Peter's PCC has the responsibility of co-operating with the Vicar and other clergy allocated to St Peter's Church in promoting the whole mission of the church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical; both within the ecclesiastical parish and across the wider area of the Jubilee River Group of Anglican parishes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £125,251
Total expenditure: £134,396

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Slough

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST PETER'S PCC, BURNHAM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAMELA ROGERS Trustee 22 April 2025
None on record
Susanne Lowe Trustee 22 April 2025
None on record
Rev susan smith Trustee 22 April 2025
None on record
Rev josh cleaver Trustee 19 March 2025
None on record
Victoria Samson Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Hannah Lewis Trustee 13 June 2021
None on record
Jacqueline Loveday-Fisher Trustee 13 September 2020
None on record
Christopher Knight Trustee 25 September 2019
None on record
Michaela Cottrell Trustee 13 September 2019
None on record
Stephan Carr Dobson Trustee 26 April 2015
BURNHAM CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Fiona Mary Burridge Trustee 27 April 2014
None on record
EMMA WARBURTON Trustee 25 July 2013
None on record
JOHN ALAN CAREY Trustee 09 August 2012
BURNHAM CARE AND SHARE
Recently registered
PETER LEWIS Trustee
BURNHAM CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES
Received: On time
IAN FORDYCE Trustee
THE CHURCHES FELLOWSHIP FOR PSYCHICAL AND SPIRITUAL STUDIES
Received: 31 days late
SHEILA WARBURTON Trustee
None on record
ROB DUNSTER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £130.24k £108.96k £111.29k £132.89k £125.25k
Total expenditure £134.90k £143.31k £132.94k £143.53k £134.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 08 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Cornerstone
Church Street
Burnham
SLOUGH
SL1 7HX
Phone:
01628 664338