J.A.R.E. AIRLINE TRAINING PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities are based around our charitable aims: To advance the education of the public in the subjects of Airline, Airport & Aviation Studies and related industries. We offer nationally accredited programmes to give those interested in an aviation career an insight into a range of roles as well as practical experience in real and realistic airline & airport and related work environments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Poole
Governance
- 24 July 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Norman Scott EASTON FCMI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JULIE ANN RUSHTON CERT ED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.17k | £2.34k | £2.51k | £2.54k | £2.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.22k | £2.30k | £2.30k | £2.30k | £2.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 27 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECTS OF AIRLINE, AIRPORT & AVIATION STUDIES AND RELATED INDUSTRIES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
B737 AVIATION & TRAINING CENTRE
307NE
COMMERCIAL ROAD
BOURNEMOUTH INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT
HURN, CHRISTCHURCH, DORSET
BH23 6NW
- Phone:
- 01202582354
- Email:
- mail@jare-atp.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window