Financial history RESTORERS HOUSE INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1129173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.43k £4.56k £8.59k £8.45k £7.40k
Total expenditure £8.34k £6.50k £7.80k £9.49k £8.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A