THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, ASHBY DE LA ZOUCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the mission of the Church within the Ecclesiastical Parish and provide a benefit to the public by: providing facilities for public worship, pastoral care, spiritual and moral development for anyone who wishes to benefit from what the Church offers: promoting Christian values, and service by members of the Church in and to their communities, to the benefit of individuals and society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 18 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF HOLY TRINITY ASHBY DE LA ZOUCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV'D DR T L PHILLIPS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ivan Hallam | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Rachael Bull | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Taber | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Elisabeth Day | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Johnson | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Flower | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean Margaret Harrison | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Noreen Mewies | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Anne Marie Lunt | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ONIONS | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS D SAUNDERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR S CLOWES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR K F GARNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.01k | £197.44k | £197.43k | £230.11k | £205.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.17k | £135.53k | £135.53k | £161.72k | £194.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.07k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Trinity Close
ASHBY-DE-LA-ZOUCH
LE65 2GQ
- Phone:
- 01530412339
- Email:
- office@trinityashby.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window