BANNER CROSS METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BANNER CROSS METHODIST CHURCH exists as a worshipping community committed to the work of Christ in the local area by organising services and events, and by providing premises which can be used by various community groups for a wide range of activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 18 May 2009: Previously excepted registration
- BXMC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philip Peacock | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Lesley Bywaters | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Susan Mary Shelley | Trustee | 17 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edith Aisthorpe | Trustee | 27 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Rowe | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Hazel Harrison | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Lorna Marshall | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Genevieve Julie Ashton | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANET ANN SOUTHGATE | Trustee | 15 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANN BARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE BEAUMONT DUNN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA IRENE WATCHORN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL PAULA JONES BA HONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.07k | £74.33k | £130.24k | £81.59k | £130.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.86k | £80.15k | £83.44k | £88.37k | £170.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 July 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 July 2021 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BANNER CROSS METHODIST CHURCH
12 ECCLESALL ROAD SOUTH
SHEFFIELD
S11 9PE
- Phone:
- 01142589223
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window