LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF WALES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 13 August 1970: Standard registration
- 31 March 2005: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 31 March 2005: Funds transferred to 701408 SOUTH GLAMORGAN HEALTH CHARITABLE FUND
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2004 | 12 April 2005 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MAY 1970
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF WALES WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM ORIN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
CARDIFF AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window