Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE HOLY SPIRIT ,BEDGROVE, AYLESBURY
Charity number: 1129869

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MARTIN KUHRT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Chris Parrott | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Storey | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sally Waugh | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim Rees | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Brooks | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Daniel Nixon | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margery Bell | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Haines | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Millar | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROGER HARWOOD | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robin Scott | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.