Accounts and annual returns ROADS TO RECOVERY

Charity Number: 1131983
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2011 27 June 2012 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2010 09 August 2011 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 03 March 2011 On Time