ANLABY PARK METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religous actitivities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 16 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Helen Elizabeth Hickson | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Thelma MacMaster | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Cross | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jasper Charles Miles | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marion Florence Dawson | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Carol Baker | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Carling Simpson | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ROBINSON | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA HAMMONDS | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL JOANNE PEARSON | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Spry | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Marie Taylor | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MARY RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENISE BRENDA ROBINSON FCIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ROSE HORNSBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £329.56k | £294.57k | £233.26k | £281.91k | £294.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £347.66k | £334.76k | £257.83k | £331.54k | £326.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £119.46k | £131.39k | £140.58k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Anlaby Park Methodist Church
256 Hull Road
Anlaby Common
HULL
HU4 7RR
- Phone:
- 01482502705
- Email:
- contact@apmc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window