The City Church

Charity number: 1130031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Christian Church

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
  • 24 June 2020: Funds received from 802118 THE CITY CHURCH CANTERBURY
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • THE CITY CHURCH CANTERBURY (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Ernest Gregory Chair 13 May 2021
None on record
Foluso Thomas Trustee 06 November 2023
None on record
Alex Ntung Trustee 24 July 2023
None on record
Martin Steven Segal Trustee 15 May 2017
None on record
Kathryn Muriel Bailey Trustee 15 May 2017
None on record
SIMON DAVID CLARK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £534.23k £502.81k £498.78k £491.52k £506.09k
Total expenditure £567.37k £533.38k £498.75k £520.25k £482.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £477.78k £488.10k N/A N/A £481.80k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £53.76k £12.79k N/A N/A £20.18k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £2.69k £1.93k N/A N/A £4.11k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £567.37k £533.38k N/A N/A £482.36k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £1.20k N/A N/A £1.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £12.74k £9.26k N/A N/A £12.24k
Long-term investments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Other assets £1.04m £1.02m N/A N/A £1.01m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities £13.85k £17.99k N/A N/A £16.14k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 25 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 20 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 26 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 27 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 24 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The City Church
34A Simmonds Road
Wincheap Industrial Estate
CANTERBURY
Kent
CT1 3RA
Phone:
01227455440