GREENWOOD ACADEMIES TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
Governance
- 16 August 2010: Standard registration
- 25 August 2011: Removed (Exempt charity)
- NOTTINGHAM ACADEMY TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ADOPTED 15 JULY 2010 AND REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 2 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING, CARRYING ON, MANAGING AN DEVELOPING SCHOOLS ('THE ACADEMIES'); OFFERING A BROAD CURRICULUM WITH A STRONG EMPHASIS ON, BUT IN NO WAY LIMITED TO EITHER ONE, OR A COMBINATION OF THE SPECIALISMS SPECIFIED IN THE RELEVANT FUNDING AGREEMENTS
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.