FRIENDS OF CASTLE WOOD SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise funds to support all disabled children, these children range from having additional needs, medical needs and physical needs, we support them at after school clubs, Saturday clubs and holiday schemes with in Coventry. We also offer information and sign posting to parents, carers and family members for help and assistance with daily living tasks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 17 March 2010: Standard registration
- 27 September 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 27 September 2021: Funds transferred to 1043360 MIDLAND MENCAP
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.98k | £45.88k | £47.70k | £41.28k | £41.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.43k | £25.90k | £32.43k | £51.10k | £69.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 07 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 07 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF COVENTRY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND SUPPORT, AN OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB, AN ANNUAL SUMMER SCHEME AND AN ANNUAL DAY TRIP FOR THE CHILDREN, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Area of benefit
COVENTRY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window