THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HAWLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parochial Church Council is a Body Corporate for the advancement of religion created by statute (namely The PCC (Powers) Measure 1956
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

15 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 16 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- HAWLEY GREEN PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev William Francis Pitfield Perry | Chair | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Allen Brown | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Davies | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marian King | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Popay | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hoy | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Carter | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Paul Murton | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MIKE GUNSTON | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Brown | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Harry Bangs | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Earl Rapley | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Wilkinson | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Blanchard | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rita Audrey DAVIES | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £254.49k | £151.37k | £178.34k | £73.28k | £75.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.17k | £133.77k | £133.93k | £113.62k | £106.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £428 | N/A | £525 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Vicarage
Fernhill Road
Blackwater
Camberley
Surrey
GU17 9BN
- Phone:
- 01276 609498
- Email:
- hawleyenquiries@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window