Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WERRINGTON ST JOHN THE BAPTIST WITH EMMANUEL
Charity number: 1130249

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sue Fear | Chair | 27 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Rev Robert Wesley Seaman | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janice Lowe | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Hill | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Benoy | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Kay Platts | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alison Williams | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Lidgett | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Dalrymple | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Louise Oldaker | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paula Greaves | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Robert Whitaker | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Cooke | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Tabor | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kevin Fear | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Trounce | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brian Frederick Hunt | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|||||
SUE BENNETT | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN HORSPOLE | Trustee | 19 July 2013 |
|
|||||
ROBERT GREGORY-SMITH | Trustee | 04 September 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.