Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH PITSMOOR, SHEFFIELD
Charity number: 1129500

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philip John Salmon | Chair | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev William Duncan Gowers | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATE THOMPSON | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Hill Ross | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Mark Edmondson | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Chadwick | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Blessing Dienye Pepple | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Skinner | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dienye Hector Pepple | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Limb | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Michael Allen Treadaway | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Newman | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Platts | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Alyson Crowley | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Rouine | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.