THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, NOTTING HILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious and Community activities Helping to alleviate the major problems and issues confronting people in the UK such as Human Trafficking, Abuse of Human rights, Justice issues, Racial and Gender discrimination, Socio -psychological problems, lack of community life, organisational co-operation and support system within and among huge majority of migrantss.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 24 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHNS, NOTTING HILL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Hayward | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Ojuri | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mayla Aranguran | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Snow Sterling | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pitts Robinson | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lungo | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tommy Barnham-Hyatt | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Silverio | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iamm Rigor | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oluyomi Sosanya | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paula Lawton | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matan Sowatskey | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Burnett-Hall | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev LARRY GALON | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Myrna Ocomen | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER ST JOHN | Trustee | 02 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
CLLR GERARD HARGREAVES | Trustee | 02 May 2012 |
|
|||||
CRISETA QUISTO LAUGHLIN | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev William H Taylor | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £402.61k | £258.80k | £297.40k | £337.55k | £362.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £384.15k | £272.81k | £276.73k | £334.62k | £351.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.37k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JOHNS CHURCH
LANSDOWNE CRESCENT
LONDON
W11 2NN
- Phone:
- 02077274262
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window