Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KINGSTHORPE

Charity number: 1130370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £137.58k £110.60k £114.23k £185.41k £148.56k
Total expenditure £151.20k £131.64k £115.10k £119.75k £137.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £369 £1.94k £532 £2.68k £12.72k