THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST GABRIEL'S, CRICKLEWOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing regular public worship for all; Serving the community; Teaching the faith to all ages; Providing training, nurture and activities for children and young people; Promoting the Christian faith; Giving pastoral care and support to members and others in need; Debt Counselling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brent
Governance
- 30 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST GABRIEL'S CHURCH, CRICKLEWOOD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev James Paul Yeates | Chair | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Derrick Green | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hiva Salehzadeh | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isabelle Ajani | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Patterson | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Stubbins | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Jane Aber-Luwum | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rose Emma Streatfeild | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tuong Vi Le-Magowan | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anita Olive Olayinka Bowen | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ola Faith Mba | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colleen Angela Francis | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Ajani | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patience Asare-Tweneboah | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Philip Vivian | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Russell Wolffe | Trustee | 06 June 2013 |
|
|||||
Winsome Cleone Spence | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £208.11k | £241.95k | £216.40k | £342.64k | £232.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £251.91k | £270.53k | £241.51k | £297.04k | £279.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £45.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. GABRIELS (C OF E) CHURCH
WALM LANE
LONDON
NW2 4RX
- Phone:
- 02088306626
- Email:
- office@st-gabriels.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window