THE JIMMY DIXON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust makes grants to support community-based youth work in line with its charitable objectives. The Trust does not accept unsolicited applications for grant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 August 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOUGLAS FREDERICK PRATT | Chair |
|
||||||
CLARE HELEN WADD | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT LESLIE HOLBEN | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
KEELEY CLEMANCIA WILLIAMS | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROSIE BESS FERGUSON | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS ADAM BARNES WILKIE | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.73k | £52.23k | £55.23k | £56.29k | £57.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.05k | £57.62k | £57.78k | £226.50k | £9.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 05 APR 2006
Charitable objects
THE ORIGINAL TRUSTEES DECLARE THAT, FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED, THE TRUST FUND SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME (OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE INCOME) TO EDUCATE BOYS AND YOUNG MEN AND GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN RESIDENT IN ENGLAND AND WALES, THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL MORAL AND CULTURAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT CHARITABLE AND OTHER BODIES OPERATING IN THE FIELD OF YOUTH WORK PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL ALSO HAVE POWER IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Wolsey Drive
Kingston upon Thames
KT2 5DP
- Phone:
- 07800833797
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window