Accounts and annual returns FREEDOM CLUB TIME BANK

Charity Number: 1133898
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 16 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 03 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 09 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 12 July 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 12 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 23 September 2011 On Time