Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WRINGTON

Charity number: 1132636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID MARSH Chair 23 April 2017
None on record
Jane Watson Trustee 17 May 2022
None on record
Linda Wood Trustee 17 May 2022
None on record
Jill Daphne Bagnall Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record
ROGER VINCENT Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Deirdre Taylor Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
Philip Kinsman Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
Katy O'Connor Trustee 10 April 2014
None on record
ANDREW HARVEY WHITING Trustee
FRIENDS OF WRINGTON CHURCHYARD
Received: On time