GUILDFORD BOOK FESTIVAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE APPRECIATION, UNDERSTANDING AND ENJOYMENT OF LITERATURE AND THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BY OPERATING AN ANNUAL LITERARY FESTIVAL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 August 2009: Standard registration
- 10 November 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 10 November 2016: Funds transferred to 1158746 GUILDFORD BOOK FESTIVAL
- N/A (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.27k | £80.08k | £107.12k | £60.84k | £68.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.51k | £82.16k | £82.99k | £56.97k | £69.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 28 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 28 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 22 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 22 October 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 19 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 19 September 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE APPRECIATION, UNDERSTANDING AND ENJOYMENT OF LITERATURE AND THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BY OPERATING AN ANNUAL LITERARY FESTIVAL.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window