Financial history BIOCENTRE UK

Charity number: 1135923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.00k £4.00k £4.00k £4.00k £693
Total expenditure £3.30k £1.18k £1.76k £4.24k £3.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A