BIOCENTRE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BioCentre UK is a British think-tank focusing on emerging technologies and their ethical, social and political implications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 May 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Julia Manning | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Prof NIGEL CAMERON | Trustee | 02 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
PROF JOHN WYATT MB BS,FRCP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.00k | £4.00k | £4.00k | £4.00k | £693 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.30k | £1.18k | £1.76k | £4.24k | £3.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 17 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
"THE CHARITY'S OBJECT IS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON THE SUBJECT OF BIOTECHNOLOGY AND OTHER EMERGING TECHNOLOGIES (IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE SCIENTIFIC ARENA AND AS REGARDS THE MORAL AND ETHICAL IMPLICATIONS OF SUCH TECHNOLOGIES) INCLUDING PROMOTING RESEARCH IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT AND TO PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH".
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BIOCENTRE
PO BOX 65112
LONDON
SW1P 9PU
- Phone:
- 02072274706
- Email:
- info@bioethics.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window