Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, CHORLEYWOOD

Charity number: 1129662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £611.66k £674.16k £629.92k £770.72k £745.03k
Total expenditure £689.47k £680.92k £642.74k £792.35k £759.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £14.41k £3.72k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £514.97k £576.21k £546.88k £647.45k £606.29k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £4.81k £0
Income - Charitable activities £86.46k £46.44k £31.48k £56.65k £62.58k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.47k £49.50k £47.82k £56.64k £72.97k
Income - Other £7.76k £2.02k £3.74k £5.17k £3.19k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £28.56k £6.88k £4.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £681.82k £680.92k £642.74k £731.08k £744.65k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £61.27k £14.38k
Expenditure - Governance £5.04k £7.63k £4.00k £7.00k £5.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £110.27k £109.02k £97.05k £134.45k £108.78k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £61.27k £14.38k
Expenditure - Other £7.66k £0 £0 £0 £0