Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, CHORLEYWOOD
Charity number: 1129662

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVID HALL | Chair | 02 September 2012 |
|
|||||
Valerie Omolola Sodeinde | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Neville Aston | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Peter Chapman | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rue Grewal | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Farr | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Lilley | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenni Hudson | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Terence Russoff | Trustee | 02 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Sullivan | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA MANN | Trustee | 06 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.