Accounts and annual returns PROVIDENCE MARIAN COMPANY

Charity number: 1133491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window