Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WARFIELD

Charity number: 1129301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Isabel Jane Green Trustee 06 April 2025
None on record
Dr Judith Ridell Trustee 06 April 2025
None on record
Jane Elizabeth Clark Trustee 06 April 2025
None on record
Eileen Scott Trustee 06 April 2025
None on record
Victoria Clare Doherty Trustee 03 September 2024
None on record
Alison Horner Le Riche Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Janet Mauler Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
David French Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Philip Durbin Trustee 23 January 2024
THE BROWNLOW MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
Kevin Pearcey Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Gaynor Boulton Trustee 25 March 2023
None on record
Paul Allen Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record
Christopher Drage Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record
Rev David Chislett Trustee 03 July 2021
None on record
Juliet Date Trustee 16 March 2021
None on record
Ashley Hill Trustee 02 April 2019
None on record