ST JOHN'S METHODIST CHURCH, POTTERS BAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ÔÇó Regular public acts of worship open to all ÔÇó Teaching and promotion of Christianity through sermons, small groups, events, services and courses ÔÇó Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved ÔÇó Clubs and meetings for all with a Christian ethos ÔÇó Provision of Nursery Playgroups in Potters Bar ÔÇó Supporting other charities financially and with prayer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £284,050 from 1 government grant(s)
People

21 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 21 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Jebb | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Susan Elizabeth Branch | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher John Humphreys | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Margaret Helen Strand | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
GUY ALAIN FENNER | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr John Sterland | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Constance Myra Louise Sloper | Trustee | 12 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Sally Jane Gunning | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Lousie margaret Bourton | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
David Neil Rhodes | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Maggie Lorriane Day | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Val Parker | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID LAWRENCE CARTER | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Helen Jeckells | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||
DAWN JENNETTE FENNER | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID JOHN BOWLER | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr John Jenvey Sloper | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
ROBERT HARVEY WARD | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|||||||||
KATHRYN FRANCES KRAUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PATRICIA ANN GRIFFITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
STEPHEN ROY KRAUSE BSC PGDIP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £375.32k | £354.07k | £374.12k | £496.00k | £439.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £364.88k | £361.21k | £358.75k | £455.87k | £463.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £226.41k | £229.27k | £252.12k | £322.43k | £284.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 Baker Street
POTTERS BAR
Hertfordshire
EN6 2EX
- Phone:
- 01707 652978
- Email:
- info@stjohnspb.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window