BAILDON COMMUNITY LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Baildon Link will identify the collective and individual needs of the members of the community, explore potential responses to those needs, decide on the most appropriate responses by taking or facilitating action to meet those needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £62,283 from 12 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 17 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Anthony Vaughan | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Carolyn Margaret Hargreaves | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Roger Howard Armstrong | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
JOHN BRIGGS | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Jeffrey Garside Thompson | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.06k | £103.93k | £108.61k | £95.56k | £110.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.15k | £89.34k | £107.93k | £118.30k | £121.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £66.27k | £85.72k | £73.53k | £53.36k | £62.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JUNE 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BAILDON IN WEST YORKSHIRE (BY WHICH PLACE NAME IS INCLUDED BOTH THE BAILDON WARD OF THE CITY OF BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT AND THE AREA OF BAILDON PARISH COUNCIL) AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BAILDON IN WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Baildon Community Link
35 Cliffe Avenue
Baildon
SHIPLEY
BD17 6NX
- Phone:
- 01274588681
- Email:
- baildon.link@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window