KERALA CULTURAL AND WELFARE ASSOCIATION (KCWA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cultural and recreational activities, Education, welfare services,Sports activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Sutton
Governance
- 30 September 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MELVIN GOMEZ | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robby Sunder | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shah Haridas | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sona Ambili Sarika | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Johnson Geevarghese | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAMODARAN PAVITHRAN | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jayaschandran Pillai | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hashim Kunjumuhammed | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Seely Premkumar Nair | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
NAZIR BABU BALAKRISHNAN | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarika Ambili | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUNNY JANARDANAN | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aparna Chandrasekar | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAYARAJ DAMODARAN | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aloshias Agustin | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.80k | £22.63k | £21.47k | £18.82k | £27.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.30k | £19.11k | £14.60k | £28.64k | £39.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 October 2022 | 246 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY AMONGST THE MALAYALEE COMMUNITY BY: A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; C) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH; AND D) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON ALL ASPECTS OF MALAYALEE HISTORY, ART AND CULTURE. 3) TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN RACIAL GROUPS; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS;
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
87 Woodville Road
THORNTON HEATH
Surrey
CR7 8LP
- Phone:
- 07746104511
- Email:
- post@kcwa.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window