THE RIDGMONT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity for the provision of a village hall and other charitable activities for the benefit of the residents of Ridgmont in Bedfordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
Governance
- 29 June 2009: Standard registration
- RIDGMONT VILLAGE HALL CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIM STOKES | Chair | 08 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Yexley | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Dray | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Doherty | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Chaplin | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Spearing | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gill | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allison Ruth Jakes | Trustee | 13 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.62k | £1.82k | £1.15k | £2.23k | £3.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £166 | £166 | £0 | £197 | £1.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 25 FEBRUARY 2010. as amended on 01 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
(1) SUBJECT TO THIS CLAUSE, THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES. AND (B) OTHER FORMS OR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION. WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. (2) IF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY IS NO LONGER REQUIRED FOR THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE AREA OF BENEFIT, THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY WILL BE THE PROMOTION OF GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (3) SUBJECT TO CLAUSE 25, THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART ONE OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE COMMITTEE FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
BEDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Church Street
Ridgmont
Bedfordshire
MK43 0TZ
- Phone:
- 07742106115
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window