NRC SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running social activities for present and past clients of the Royal Free Neurological Rehabilitation Centre (and its predecessor the Marie Foster Centre) and their families and carers. Providing medical equipment and other facilities for use at the Centre. Providing financial assistance to present and past clients for the purchase of items to help with their rehabilitation or disability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
- Brent
- Enfield
- Haringey
- Harrow
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 04 August 2009: Standard registration
- 08 April 2022: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 08 April 2022: Funds transferred to 1165672 THE ROYAL FREE CHARITY
- MFC SUPPORT (Working name)
- MARIE FOSTER CENTRE SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.77k | £2.60k | £33.15k | £3 | £7 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.53k | £3.08k | £2.44k | £3.42k | £7.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 March 2021 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 21 February 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | 23 June 2021 | 504 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 08/04/2010 AS AMENDED ON 07/11/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE (A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CLIENTS AND PAST CLIENTS OF THE NEUROLOGICAL REHABILITATION CENTRE OR THE MARIE FOSTER CENTRE, AND THE CARERS OF SUCH CLIENTS AND PAST CLIENTS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID CLIENTS, PAST CLIENTS AND CARERS. (B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF THE CLIENTS AND PAST CLIENTS OF THE NEUROLOGICAL REHABILITATION CENTRE OR THE MARIE FOSTER CENTRE, AND THE CARERS OF SUCH CLIENTS AND PAST CLIENTS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE CLIENTS OF THE NEUROLOGICAL REHABILITATION CENTRE OR THE MARIE FOSTER CENTRE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. THE NEUROLOGICAL REHABILITATION CENTRE, KNOWN AS NRC, IS LOCATED AT EDGWARE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND OPERATED BY THE ROYAL FREE HAMPSTEAD NHS TRUST. THE MARIE FOSTER CENTRE IS A FORMER HEALTH CARE FACILITY THAT WAS OPERATED BY THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE AND LOCATED IN WOOD STREET, BARNET.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window