THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST THOMAS, OAKWOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian ministry
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Enfield
- Belgium
- India
- Japan
- Serbia
Governance
- 01 May 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST THOMAS'S OAKWOOD PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Alldritt | Chair | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Njoroge | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Ronke Olayinka Omotoso | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elliott Owen | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Innocent Izamoje | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janelle Budinski | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Christopher Baxter | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stella Roberts | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohan Yogendran | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Giles | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sean Tiptaft | Trustee | 18 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ROSEMARY MAGGS | Trustee | 22 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr HARRIET JENNIFER MITCHELL | Trustee | 14 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW LEWIS | Trustee | 13 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDY REID | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW PEEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRIS GOODLAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD JOHN LAURENCE STONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £297.55k | £273.83k | £264.97k | £277.00k | £305.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £406.92k | £268.79k | £300.72k | £275.79k | £258.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.82k | £1.62k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Thomas Church
Prince George Avenue
LONDON
N14 4SN
- Phone:
- 02082459152
- Email:
- office@st-toms.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window