GURUKULAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORTS IMPOVERISHED CHILDREN HELPS WITH EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF CHILDREN FROM POOR BACK GROUND AND SUPPORT THEIR FOOD PROGRAMME DURING SCHOOL HOURS. SUPPORT WITH EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS HELP ORGANISATIONS WITH INFRA STRUCTURE SUPPORT TO MEET THE NEEDS FOR EDUCATING CHILDREN FROM POVERTY BACKGROUND
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kirklees
- India
Governance
- 13 May 2009: Standard registration
- GURUKULAM-A TUSTCHILDREN'S SCHOOL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nitish Dharmar | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sunder Dharmar | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr VANDNA THAKUR DHARMAR MDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER JAMES WAIN BDS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.75k | £6.16k | £6.21k | £7.39k | £9.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.30k | £5.00k | £197 | £10.15k | £5.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 03 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 09 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 24 APRIL 2009 as amended on 05 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY SUPPORTING THE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES OF GURUKULAM - A TRUST CHILDREN'S SCHOOL BASED IN CHENNAI, INDIA
Area of benefit
CHENNAI, INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 THORNHILL ROAD
HUDDERSFIELD
HD3 3DD
- Phone:
- 01484364657
- Email:
- SUNDHARMAR@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window