Accounts and annual returns THE HALESOWEN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1130576
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 19 June 2024 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 31 October 2023 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 31 October 2023 518 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 October 2023 883 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 31 October 2023 1248 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required