THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, KINGS LANGLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regularpublicworshipopentoall.Theprovisionofsacredspaceforpersonalprayerandcontemplation. Pastoralwork,includingvisitingthesickandthebereaved.TeachingChristianity,throughsermons,coursesandsmallgroups.PromotionofChristianitythroughthestagingofeventsandmeetings,andthedistributionofliterature.PromotingthewholemissionoftheChurch.SupportingothercharitiesintheUKandabroad.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 26 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS PCC, KINGS LANGLEY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN MCADAM | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Eric Martin | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hughes | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Dowling | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Head | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
SIMON ISHERWOOD | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Southgate | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wragg | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev James McDonald | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Ashman | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Brazier | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Allen | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Humberstone | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Keith Martin Gower | Trustee | 08 July 2013 |
|
|||||
MRS CAROLYN ANDREWS | Trustee | 14 June 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £255.80k | £98.84k | £91.45k | £109.37k | £122.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.09k | £77.31k | £84.76k | £111.09k | £129.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church
Church Lane
Kings Langley
WD4 8JS
- Phone:
- 07503 950315
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window