STANAH PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1129540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objective of the Stanah School PTFA is to raise funds for the school in order to advance the education of pupils at the school. We aim to achieve this through: developing effective relationships between staff, parents and others associated with the school; and engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £8,949
Total expenditure: £8,462

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 May 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • STANAH PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicola McVeigh Chair 14 January 2020
None on record
Elouise Frances Pelham Trustee 03 October 2024
1ST THORNTON-CLEVELEYS SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
James Pirie Trustee 19 September 2023
None on record
Scarlett Richardson Trustee 27 September 2022
None on record
Sally Anne Craven Trustee 27 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.20k £1.73k £3.13k £8.81k £8.95k
Total expenditure £6.64k £1.68k £581 £7.58k £8.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 29 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 September 2022 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 March 2022 258 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Stanah Primary School
Lambs Road
Cleverleys
THORNTON-CLEVELEYS
FY5 5JR
Phone:
01253 825225