HARROW BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities Makes grants to organisations Provides buildings/facilities/open space Provides services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,585 from 9 government contract(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Brent
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 27 May 2009: Previously excepted registration
- COLLEGE ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Femo Amao | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Wade | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Artus | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Duffy | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Christine Jackson-Hales | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Artus | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Frederick Hughes | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark William Jeffreys | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROL FOX | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANDREW JACKSON | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ETHERIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOUGLAS ETHERIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.32k | £164.99k | £151.82k | £155.96k | £187.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £200.59k | £208.65k | £214.10k | £221.87k | £202.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £2.58k | £480 | £5.02k | £8.59k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.34k | £29.35k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARROW BAPTIST CHURCH
COLLEGE ROAD
HARROW
HA1 1BA
- Phone:
- 02088637837
- Email:
- hbc1office@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window