Trustees HARROW BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1129832

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Femo Amao | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Wade | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Artus | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Duffy | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Christine Jackson-Hales | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Artus | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Frederick Hughes | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark William Jeffreys | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROL FOX | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANDREW JACKSON | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ETHERIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOUGLAS ETHERIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.