BARAKA COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Baraka Community Partnerships pbjectives are to promote sustainable development for the benefit of Disadvantaged Communities and to advance the education, healthcare and community life of the people in Disadvantage Communities. The charity is currently working with Disadvanataged Communities in Morocco, Zambia and Laos.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Laos
- Zambia
Governance
- 27 July 2009: Standard registration
- BCP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martha Love | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Peter John Skinner | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|||||
GRAHAM JOHN PORTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DANIEL SIMON MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY JULIA LEUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD THORNTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £213.52k | £219.10k | £214.77k | £267.12k | £451.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £180.16k | £204.68k | £228.33k | £285.87k | £387.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 APRIL 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 6 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES BY: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN THE DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (B) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; AND 3.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, HEALTHCARE AND COMMUNITY LIFE OF THE PEOPLE IN DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION AND HEALTHCARE OF THE DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES, "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS. "DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES" MEANS THE COMMUNITIES OF TIJZHA AND IGRISS, MOROCCO, AND CHIKUMBI AND LUSAKA, ZAMBIA AND ANY OTHER COMMUNITIES OUTSIDE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM HEREINAFTER IDENTIFIED BY THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
TIJZHA AND IGRISS, MOROCCO,TIJZHA AND IGRISS, MOROCCO, CHIKUMBI AND LUSAKA, ZAMBIA AND ANY OTHER COMMUNITIES OUTSIDE OF THE UNITED
Contact information
- Address:
-
84 Gaston Way
SHEPPERTON
Middlesex
TW17 8EY
- Phone:
- 07504987367
- Email:
- information.baraka@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window