RAF Benson Junior Ranks Welfare Fund

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Service Funds are estabilished for the benefit of Service personnel to promote efficiency which underpins esprit de corps and team working.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 18 May 2009: Standard registration
- RAF BENSON SIF (Working name)
- SERVICE INSTITUTE FUND RAF BENSON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alice Tierney MA RAF | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.70k | £50.79k | £24.78k | £42.02k | £29.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.77k | £29.88k | £25.85k | £32.64k | £26.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
02 May 2024 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 May 2023 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 11 DECEMBER 2006 as amended on 08 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TTHE CHARITY'S OBJECT (THE OBJECT) IS THE PROMOTION OF MILITARY EFFICIENCY BY THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF SOCIAL, SPORTING AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE EFFICIENCY AND WELL-BEING OF SERVICEMEN AND SERVICEWOMEN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Air Force
Benson
Wallingford
OX10 6AA
- Phone:
- 01491825378
- Email:
- BEN-BSW-Accounts@mod.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window