COMMUNITY OF SAINT JOHN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Newham
- Cameroon
- France
Governance
- 25 January 2011: Standard registration
- "CONGREGATION SAINT JEAN" (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Patrick Jean Diouf | Chair | 20 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Arnaud Cuvelier | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Thomas Edwards | Trustee | 31 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Fr John Moloney | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.45k | £166.34k | £92.60k | £75.05k | £107.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.93k | £149.21k | £111.74k | £85.86k | £112.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECT: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND THROUGHOUT THE EUROPEAN UNION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND STATEMENTS OF BELIEF OF THE COMMUNITY OF SAINT JOHN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ASSISTING AND ENCOURAGING THE FORMATION OF PRIESTS AND THE ACTIVITIES OF CONSECRATED PERSONS AND OTHER INTERESTED PERSONS FOR THE SERVICE OF THEIR RESPECTIVE COMMUNITIES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COMMON PURPOSE OF THE COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN. AT THEIR DISCRETION, THE TRUSTEES MAY SPEND ALL OR PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE OBJECT.
Area of benefit
UK AND EUROPEAN UNION
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Friary
St. Antonys Road
London
E7 9QB
- Phone:
- 02084720433
- Email:
- london@stjean.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window