THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KETTERING CHRIST THE KING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer. Pastoral work. Teaching of Christianity through sermons. small groups and courses. Provision of youth and childrens activities with a Christian ethos. Promoting whole mission of the church through provision of Christian activities for all age groups. Supporting other charities in UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 10 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 23 April 2019: Funds received from 1109723 KETTERING PERSPECTIVE TRUST
- CHRIST THE KING CHURCH - KETTERING (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Reverend Canon Dr ROBIN JOHN BEWLEY | Chair | 17 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Russell Kaye | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|||||
DIANE JOHNSON | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Corinne Lucy Olivia Broughton | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Bilney | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Gary Weal | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart John Welch | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Karen Louise Robinson | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Alan Robinson | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sarah Grace Bennett | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Robert Carman | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Bell | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mr Steve Dodman | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR ANDY HOTCHIN | Trustee | 17 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £458.42k | £388.60k | £333.93k | £350.28k | £446.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £353.13k | £368.31k | £294.71k | £320.45k | £802.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £1.00k | N/A | £365 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ the King Church
Deeble Road
Kettering
NN15 7AA
- Phone:
- 01536 517553
- Email:
- office@ctk.org.uk
- Website:
-
ctk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window