THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF LEIGH, (DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious and Social Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 10 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- LEIGH ST. CLEMENT'S P.C.C. (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET ELISABETH HENNING | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Myles Ronald Owen | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Macallan | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander William Pink | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Charles Gordon Jell | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Jean Chapman | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Wilkins | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Monk | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Irene Harwood | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Margaret Alden | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lillian Smith | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wilkins | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Hackett | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Meri Sams | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
HILARY MARGARET STOWE | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marcus Anthony Pittman | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev CHERRY ELIZABETH SANDOVER PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE MARY FOLLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA ANN BRADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £492.60k | £124.90k | £203.23k | £135.13k | £129.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £322.94k | £157.32k | £187.37k | £174.95k | £194.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
112 FLEMMING AVENUE
LEIGH-ON-SEA
SS9 3AX
- Phone:
- 01702471799
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window