CHEADLE HULME METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious and community activities for all age groups including regular worship services, activities for young people and old people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

22 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Stockport
Governance
- 24 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CHMC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV LOUISE GOUGH MA | Chair | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Elaine Mary Busby | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
BARBARA CLARKE | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Kathleen Mary Lee | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Lesley Margaret Peacock BA | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID CLARK | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Wendy Anne Turner | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Margaret Pattie | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Robert Andrew Bartindale | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Geraldine Butterworth | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Valerie Pickwell | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Maurice William Turnpenny BSc | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
JUDITH ANNE HUTTON | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
David Henry James | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|||||||||
DR ANDREW HARDMAN | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Helen Deaville | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Pamela Anne Howie BA | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Patricia Grace James | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Margaret Parker | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|||||||||
Gillian Margaret Smith | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
HAZEL MARGARET CRUMMETT | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
BARBARA CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.10k | £149.26k | £165.58k | £146.57k | £203.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.77k | £164.97k | £151.14k | £168.46k | £151.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.40k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 January 2025 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 January 2025 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cheadle Hulme Methodist Church
Ramillies Avenue
Cheadle Hulme
CHEADLE
Cheshire
SK8 7AL
- Phone:
- 01614787305
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window