Accounts and annual returns BARTON EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1130321
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 26 July 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2014 25 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 08 October 2015 On Time