THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, CROWTHORNE

Charity Number: 1133738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The church provides Christening, Wedding and Funeral Services, as well as services on Sundays and during the week. It reaches out to the local community in various ways including supporting the local food bank and the provision of a hardship fund.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £150,447
Total expenditure: £135,695

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bracknell Forest

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST JOHN THE BAPTIST PCC, CROWTHORNE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tracy Lynn Perrett Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Rev LAURA EMILY WHEATLEY DOWNS Trustee 13 October 2022
None on record
Veronica Burgess Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Anne Pelham Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
James Henry Wearing Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Kenneth Edward Perrett Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
HELEN ANNE PEARCE Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
JULIA MAY NORTON Trustee 01 September 2019
JOHN JAMES BRISTOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
LIA DAVIES Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
Leigh Susan Welham Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
CAROL ANNE FROST Trustee 27 April 2014
None on record
GILLIAN MARGARET GYENES B HONS Trustee
None on record
DAVID GEORGE RANCE Trustee
PINEWOOD JUDO CLUB
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £156.85k £122.98k £127.37k £141.72k £150.45k
Total expenditure £142.31k £124.61k £123.84k £146.20k £135.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £500 £500 £500 £712

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Johns Parish Church
Waterloo Road
CROWTHORNE
RG45 7NT
Phone:
01344761521
Website:

crowthorneparishchurch.org.uk