Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, CROWTHORNE
Charity Number: 1133738

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Verschueren | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|||||
FRANCES JANE VERSCHUEREN | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Sylvia Dungate | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Terence Dungate | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Gwendoline Carter | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Lynn Perrett | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev LAURA EMILY WHEATLEY DOWNS | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Burgess | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Pelham | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Henry Wearing | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Edward Perrett | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ANNE PEARCE | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JULIA MAY NORTON | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
LIA DAVIES | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Susan Welham | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANNE FROST | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARGARET GYENES B HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID GEORGE RANCE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.